NY S01391 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing first responder safety zones and setting speed limits in such safety zones.
Title
Relates to establishing first responder safety zones and setting speed limits in such safety zones.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.413 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1391A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.762 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05075 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation