NY S01408 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the period of immunity from prosecution for a criminal or civil action that a defendant is entitled to by virtue of holding the office of president of the United States shall not apply to the calculation of the time limitation applicable to commencement of such actions.
Title
Provides that the period of immunity from prosecution for a criminal or civil action that a defendant is entitled to by virtue of holding the office of president of the United States shall not apply to the calculation of the time limitation applicable to commencement of such actions.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.652 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.172 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01917 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - enacting clause stricken