NY S01413 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the cost sharing cap for insulin from one hundred dollars to thirty dollars.
Title
Lowers the cost sharing cap for insulin from one hundred dollars to thirty dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.486 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02383 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in insurance