NY S01415 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated persons on parole.
Title
Provides for findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated persons on parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1415A |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.392 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04231 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to codes