NY S01416 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the commissioner of mental health may authorize the certification of recovery living residence and provide a list of such residences on the department of mental hygiene's website.
Title
Provides the commissioner of mental health may authorize the certification of recovery living residence and provide a list of such residences on the department of mental hygiene's website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2022-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.307 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.91 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A08165 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse