NY S01417 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1417A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1417A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an addiction recovery supportive transportation services demonstration program to provide such transportation services to individuals while such individual is receiving treatment, including, but not limited to, inpatient, residential or outpatient treatment.
Title
Establishes an addiction recovery supportive transportation services demonstration program to provide such transportation services to individuals while such individual is receiving treatment, including, but not limited to, inpatient, residential or outpatient treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1417A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A06945 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE