NY S01441 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a service learning program for students serving as active volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers, and mandates certain features of such program.
Title
Creates a service learning program for students serving as active volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers, and mandates certain features of such program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.233 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.632 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05533 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education