NY S01442 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the aftercare of retired race horses; prohibits the slaughter of race horses and race horse breeding stock; requires that race horses be microchipped; provides for gifts for thoroughbred aftercare on tax returns.
Title
Relates to the aftercare of retired race horses; prohibits the slaughter of race horses and race horse breeding stock; requires that race horses be microchipped; provides for gifts for thoroughbred aftercare on tax returns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-01 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.50 |
2021-12-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.645 |
2021-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.658 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a4154b |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1442B |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1442A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.87 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A04154 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s1442b