NY S01461 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes credit unions to participate in the excelsior linked deposit program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes credit unions to participate in the excelsior linked deposit program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.282
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback