NY S01503 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - thru line veto memo.113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - thru line veto memo.113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid To Localities Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid To Localities Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | thru line veto memo.113 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | tabled line veto memo.60 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | thru line veto memo.113 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | line veto memo.60 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | signed chap.53 |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.355 |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1503D |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-31 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-31 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-31 | Senate | message of necessity |
2019-03-31 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.50 |
2019-03-31 | Senate | rules report cal.50 |
2019-03-31 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-31 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-31 | Senate | print number 2003d |
2019-03-31 | Senate | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-03-31 | Senate | print number 2003c |
2019-03-31 | Senate | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-03-11 | Senate | print number 2003b |
2019-03-11 | Senate | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-19 | Senate | print number 2003a |
2019-02-19 | Senate | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-18 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2003D |
2019-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.355 |
2019-03-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1503D |
2019-03-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-03-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1503C |
2019-03-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1503B |
2019-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-02-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1503A |
2019-02-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02003 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - thru line veto memo.113