NY S01504 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Assembly | THRU LINE VETO MEMO.123 |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | LINE VETO MEMO.114 |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.54 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | message of necessity |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.52 |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | substituted for a2004d |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-31 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2019-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.356 |
2019-03-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1504D |
2019-03-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-03-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1504C |
2019-03-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1504B |
2019-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-02-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1504A |
2019-02-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02004 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.123