NY S01543 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain persons from receiving compensation for legal fees, consulting, or other work performed for an industrial development agency, an economic assistance corporation or state or local authority.
Title
Prohibits certain persons from receiving compensation for legal fees, consulting, or other work performed for an industrial development agency, an economic assistance corporation or state or local authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Ethics And Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Ethics And Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1147 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1543A |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.184 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03738 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations