NY S01551 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1551A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1551A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a statewide residential revaluation exemption; defines "eligible residential property"; and provides applicability, eligibility and the exemption calculation.
Title
Creates a statewide residential revaluation exemption; defines "eligible residential property"; and provides applicability, eligibility and the exemption calculation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1551A |
2020-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01329 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES