NY S01559 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that article VII bills submitted by the governor must relate specifically to either an appropriation or a proposal to raise revenue, and be necessary in order to effectuate such appropriation or revenue proposal.
Title
Requires that article VII bills submitted by the governor must relate specifically to either an appropriation or a proposal to raise revenue, and be necessary in order to effectuate such appropriation or revenue proposal.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Bob Antonacci [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-27 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00249 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary