NY S01562 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a waiver from SUNY application fees for veterans.
Title
Provides a waiver from SUNY application fees for veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-04-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08322 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education