NY S01572 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 1572A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 1572A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides eligibility for services under the basic health program for individuals whose immigration status renders him or her ineligible for federal financial participation and who meet additional requirements.
Title
Provides eligibility for services under the basic health program for individuals whose immigration status renders him or her ineligible for federal financial participation and who meet additional requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1572A |
2022-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-02-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00880 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - reported referred to ways and means