NY S01589 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state financial literacy fund.
Title
Establishes the state financial literacy fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 1589A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.336 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A03421 (Same As) 2020-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
A09141 (Same As) 2020-07-24 - print number 9141a
A09141 (Same As) 2020-07-24 - print number 9141a