NY S01590 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state board of elections to create a system to allow a copy of the candidate and contest information contained on each ballot style submitted by each county board of elections to be accessible to the public via web.
Title
Requires the state board of elections to create a system to allow a copy of the candidate and contest information contained on each ballot style submitted by each county board of elections to be accessible to the public via web.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Senate | signed chap.410 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1125 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1590 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.213 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A163 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1125 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00163 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - signed chap.410