NY S01614 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to standing of certain relatives in custody and guardianship proceedings.
Title
Relates to standing of certain relatives in custody and guardianship proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.498 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1614A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.707 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07574 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in judiciary