NY S01615 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Civil Service Commission to immediately announce and schedule an examination for any position that provides child protection services upon the written request of a municipal civil service commission or personnel officer due to an inability to fill such position from existing lists.
Title
Requires the Civil Service Commission to immediately announce and schedule an examination for any position that provides child protection services upon the written request of a municipal civil service commission or personnel officer due to an inability to fill such position from existing lists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.655 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1615A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.765 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06813 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental employees