NY S01627 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4421B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "Harper's Law" which will require that retailers who sell certain new furniture offer for sale compatible tip restraint devices and post a notice informing consumers of the risk of furniture tipping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "Harper's Law" which will require that retailers who sell certain new furniture offer for sale compatible tip restraint devices and post a notice informing consumers of the risk of furniture tipping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A4421B
2019-05-20SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1627B
2019-05-07SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1627A
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.545
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A04421 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback