NY S01631 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fundraisers.
Title
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fundraisers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2016-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.577 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1631A |
2016-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1520 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A04052 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - print number 4052a