NY S01631 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of a missing or non-functional airbag for certain vehicles at resale or auction.
Title
Requires disclosure of a missing or non-functional airbag for certain vehicles at resale or auction.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.436 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.257 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a4470a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1631A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.687 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04470 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES