NY S01634 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - LOST
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - LOST
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to school zone speed limits; requires signage and other traffic calming devices in such speed zones.
Title
Relates to school zone speed limits; requires signage and other traffic calming devices in such speed zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | LOST |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1434 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1634B |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1634A |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.106 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00356 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation