NY S01652 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a fentanyl analogue shall be deemed to be a schedule I opiate.
Title
Provides that a fentanyl analogue shall be deemed to be a schedule I opiate.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.993 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1652A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06757 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health