NY S01656 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits industrial development agencies from incentivizing movements within the state where any plant, facility, or personnel of the project occupant are abandoned or removed.
Title
Prohibits industrial development agencies from incentivizing movements within the state where any plant, facility, or personnel of the project occupant are abandoned or removed.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.640 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMENDED 1656A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.940 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06993 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means