NY S01659 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a municipality to give notice to an adjacent municipality of the adoption or amendment of certain zoning ordinances or local laws that affect parcels of land within 500 feet of the adjacent municipality.
Title
Requires a municipality to give notice to an adjacent municipality of the adoption or amendment of certain zoning ordinances or local laws that affect parcels of land within 500 feet of the adjacent municipality.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.221 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.166 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06692 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments