NY S01660 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on active duty to receive high school diplomas.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on active duty to receive high school diplomas.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.477 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.313 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1660A |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.505 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-08 | Senate | print number 4654a |
2019-05-08 | Senate | amend and recommit to education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4654A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1660A |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.313 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04654 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - signed chap.477