NY S01661 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ratifying the proposed amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to the labor of persons under eighteen years of age.
Title
Relates to ratifying the proposed amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to the labor of persons under eighteen years of age.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06245 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - to attorney-general for opinion