NY S01662 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets a 7-year limit to the real property tax exemption for unimproved property of mandatory class nonprofit organizations.
Title
Sets a 7-year limit to the real property tax exemption for unimproved property of mandatory class nonprofit organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1662C |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1662B |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.786 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1662A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03692 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation