NY S01662 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-14)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3523A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3523A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the practice of applied behavior analysis.
Title
Relates to the practice of applied behavior analysis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3523A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1130 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1662B |
2021-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1662A |
2021-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03523 (Same As) 2021-12-30 - signed chap.818