NY S01674 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Title
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.208 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.410 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | substituted for a4737 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.423 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04737 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.208