NY S01676 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of education to establish and implement a museum education grant program to provide state aid to museums, historical societies, nature centers, zoos, botanical gardens, arboretums, aquariums and cultural organizations to establish education programs for elementary and secondary school students, and for those participating in continuing education in low-income urban, suburban or rural communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of education to establish and implement a museum education grant program to provide state aid to museums, historical societies, nature centers, zoos, botanical gardens, arboretums, aquariums and cultural organizations to establish education programs for elementary and secondary school students, and for those participating in continuing education in low-income urban, suburban or rural communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.307
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.402
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a3892a
2018-04-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-04-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-04-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.448
2018-01-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 1676A
2018-01-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1855
2017-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-10SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A03892 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s1676a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01676&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01676&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01676
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01676&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01676A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1676#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1676#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1676#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1676#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1676#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01676&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback