NY S01681 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax exemption for improvements to the property of severely injured members of the armed forces of the United States; authorizes localities to adopt a local law or resolution granting an exemption from taxation and special ad valorem levies for real property altered or improved for the purposes of removing architectural barriers that challenge the mobility of a severely injured member of the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Establishes a tax exemption for improvements to the property of severely injured members of the armed forces of the United States; authorizes localities to adopt a local law or resolution granting an exemption from taxation and special ad valorem levies for real property altered or improved for the purposes of removing architectural barriers that challenge the mobility of a severely injured member of the armed forces of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.479 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1674 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1681 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.163 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.163 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-18 | Senate | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7289 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1674 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07289 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - signed chap.479