NY S01683 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 1683A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 1683A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Title
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1683A |
2020-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00714 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS