NY S01693 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Alix's law"; relates to leaving the scene of an incident without reporting it; relates to operating a vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Title
Enacts "Alix's law"; relates to leaving the scene of an incident without reporting it; relates to operating a vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07351 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation