NY S01698 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to integrating community supervision programs into an individual's employment, educational or vocational training schedule.
Title
Relates to integrating community supervision programs into an individual's employment, educational or vocational training schedule.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.545 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.416 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05104 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION