NY S01707 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - PRINT NUMBER 1707A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - PRINT NUMBER 1707A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a New York state residential property tax relief act for public education aid apportionment for certain school years; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Provides a New York state residential property tax relief act for public education aid apportionment for certain school years; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1707A |
2020-02-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09869 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - print number 9869a