NY S01709 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.117
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04574 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback