NY S01719 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - signed chap.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - signed chap.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of unlawful dissemination or publication of an intimate image and creates a private right of action for such crime.
Title
Establishes the crime of unlawful dissemination or publication of an intimate image and creates a private right of action for such crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | signed chap.109 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.61 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1719C |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-28 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.34 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | rules report cal.34 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-25 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5981 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1719C |
2019-02-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1719B |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.61 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1719A |
2019-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |