NY S01728 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes hospital-sponsored off campus emergency departments as a "hospital" and sets out specific standards for operations, staffing and capacity requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes hospital-sponsored off campus emergency departments as a "hospital" and sets out specific standards for operations, staffing and capacity requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.533
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A06254 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback