NY S01733 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Grand Island central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Authorizes the Grand Island central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.342 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.566 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8312 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1752 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08312 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.342