NY S01736 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting the Tonawanda city school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Relates to permitting the Tonawanda city school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.499 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1333 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1736 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.117 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.117 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3628 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1333 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03628 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.499