NY S01747 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3675B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue standard drivers' licenses and restricts what information can be retained and given out on those applying or holding standard drivers' licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue standard drivers' licenses and restricts what information can be retained and given out on those applying or holding standard drivers' licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A3675B
2019-06-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1466
2019-06-17SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 1747B
2019-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 1747A
2019-05-30SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A03675 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - signed chap.37

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback