NY S01765 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to imposing an additional one percent occupancy tax in the county of Niagara to benefit the Discover Niagara Shuttle.
Title
Relates to imposing an additional one percent occupancy tax in the county of Niagara to benefit the Discover Niagara Shuttle.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.685 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1753 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1765 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.443 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.443 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2163 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1753 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02163 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.685