NY S01779 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defining "period of war" for the alternative veterans' exemption; includes more recent hostilities in the definition of "period of war".
Title
Relates to defining "period of war" for the alternative veterans' exemption; includes more recent hostilities in the definition of "period of war".
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1189 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |