NY S01795 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; relates to reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.
Title
Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; relates to reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.22 |
2021-10-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.432 |
2021-10-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.341 |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | substituted for a533 |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.900 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00533 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - substituted by s1795