NY S01804 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no penalties for late, incomplete or inaccurate data shall be assessed against managed care organizations except in cases of fraud or abuse.
Title
Provides that no penalties for late, incomplete or inaccurate data shall be assessed against managed care organizations except in cases of fraud or abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03068 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - enacting clause stricken