NY S01812 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Title
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1812A |
2022-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A05741 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - print number 5741a