NY S01817 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of biometric identity verification devices for the purchase of alcoholic beverages and tobacco products; authorizes a licensee, its agent or employee to determine a person's age when purchasing alcoholic beverages or tobacco products by use of a biometric identity verification device; establishes where the use of the device indicates that the person is under the age of twenty-one, the attempted purchase of the alcoholic beverage shall be denied.
Title
Relates to the use of biometric identity verification devices for the purchase of alcoholic beverages and tobacco products; authorizes a licensee, its agent or employee to determine a person's age when purchasing alcoholic beverages or tobacco products by use of a biometric identity verification device; establishes where the use of the device indicates that the person is under the age of twenty-one, the attempted purchase of the alcoholic beverage shall be denied.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.793 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |